MA S77 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2412
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to expungement from central registry. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to expungement from central registry
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2412 |
2017-12-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S845 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S369 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2785 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H3126 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2309 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H756 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2412 (Replaced by) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S369 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2785 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H3126 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2309 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H756 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2412 (Replaced by) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S77 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S77.pdf |