MA S789 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to attainable housing in seasonal communities. Housing.
Title
Relative to attainable housing in seasonal communities
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2530 |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2530 (Replaced by) 2020-04-01 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2530 (Replaced by) 2020-04-01 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S789 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S789.pdf |