MA S818 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to college credits while attending high school. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to college in high school
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Manny Cruz [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Pavel Payano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4521 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, March 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1270 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4265
H1286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4521 (Replaced by) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4521 (Replaced by) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S818 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S818.pdf |