MA S843 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1745
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied H1745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied H1745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide fair chances for employment. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Providing fair chances for employment
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Cleon Turner [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Karen Spilka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Accompanied H1745 |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1745 (Replaced by) 2014-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S843 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S843.pdf |