MA S885 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve certain appellate rights. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the preservation of certain appellate rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2644 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S83 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2501 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2429 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
H2463 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S83 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2501 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2429 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
H2463 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S885 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S885.pdf |