MA S922 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the child advocate’s authority to access juvenile records. The Judiciary.
Title
Clarifying the child advocate’s authority to access juvenile records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Accompanied H1558 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1558 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S980 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2837
S2837 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S980 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2837
S2837 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S922.pdf |