MA S941 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect on-call volunteers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to protections for on-call volunteers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means. |
2011-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S941 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8099&generalCourtId=1 |