MA S944 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enforce municipal ordinances and bylaws. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Cleon Turner [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-09 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S944 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S944.pdf |