MA S96 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve housing opportunities and the Massachusetts economy. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Improving housing opportunities and the Massachusetts economy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2533 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S1099 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H3685 (Similar To) 2020-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2533 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S1099 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H3685 (Similar To) 2020-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2533 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S96 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S96.pdf |