MA S961 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to municipal unemployment insurance reform. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to municipal unemployment insurance reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4605 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S486 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S488 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1283 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
S417 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S530 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S531 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S406 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4168
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S496 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S498 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S486 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S488 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1283 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
S417 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S530 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S531 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S406 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4168
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S496 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S498 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S961 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S961.pdf |