MA S970 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to suicide prevention signage at certain facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to suicide prevention signage at certain facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-01 | House | House concurred |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3458 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2226
S2507 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2507 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S970 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S970.pdf |