MA S988 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to infectious disease control. Public Health.
Title
Relative to infectious disease control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2148 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1934, H1972, H2107, S1024, S1044 and S1058 |
2013-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1934 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
H1972 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
H2107 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1024 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1044 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1058 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S2148 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
H1972 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
H2107 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1024 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1044 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S1058 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S988
S2148 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S988 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S988.pdf |