MA S996 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Accompanied H2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Accompanied H2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to dentistry licensure examinations. Public Health.
Title
Relative to dentistry licensure examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Accompanied H2080 |
2013-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2080 (Replaced by) 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S996 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S996.pdf |