MD HB1132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust, on or before July 1, 2021, to extinguish or terminate a certain easement the Trust holds in the parcel of land known as the Warfield Complex located in Carroll County; and requiring the Trust to complete certain necessary recordings and filings to complete the extinguishment or termination of the easement.
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB839 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Boundaries
Carroll County
Easements
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Land Records
Real Property
Recordings
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Carroll County
Easements
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Land Records
Real Property
Recordings
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials