MD SB839 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust, on or before July 1, 2021, to extinguish or terminate a certain easement the Trust holds in the parcel of land known as the Warfield Complex located in Carroll County; and requiring the Trust to complete certain necessary recordings and filings to complete the extinguishment or termination of the easement.
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1132 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Boundaries
Carroll County
Easements
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Land Records
Real Property
Recordings
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Carroll County
Easements
Estates and Trusts
Historical Matters
Land Records
Real Property
Recordings
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials