MD HB1253 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2025, certain health care facilities to implement a program to provide individuals admitted to the health care facility reasonable access to a telephone.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Access to Telephones
Sponsors
Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. April Fleming Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-16 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB813 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 353.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |