MD SB813 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2025, certain health care facilities to implement a program to provide individuals admitted to the health care facility reasonable access to a telephone.
Title
Health Care Facilities – Access to Telephones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1253 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 353.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0813?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0813f.pdf |