MD HB1298 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who conveys a fee simple interest in real property from recording a covenant against the title for the real property for the payment of a transfer fee; establishing that a covenant that requires the payment of a transfer fee for the conveyance of a fee simple interest in real property is void; providing specified exemptions to the prohibition in the Act; defining the term "transfer fee"; applying the Act prospectively; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Real Property - Transfer Fees - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Environmental Matters |