MD HB1454 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified employees are entitled to a specified number of business days of paid organ donation leave in a 12-month period; requiring an eligible employee to provide specified written physician verification to the employer to receive organ donation leave; authorizing an employer to require an eligible employee to substitute a specified number of days of paid leave for any part or all of the period of organ donation leave under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Organ Donation Leave
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Del. Andrew Platt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Leave
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment