MD HB173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from disposing of yard waste collected on the grounds of a State building or a State highway in a single-use plastic container; requiring a person to collect yard waste on the grounds of a State building or a State highway in a container that will not be discarded with the yard waste or is a compostable paper bag; and providing that the Act does not apply to a person disposing of noxious weeds, as designated by the Department of Agriculture, or invasive species.
Title
State Buildings and State Highways - Collection of Yard Waste
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-38) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283722/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-10-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Building Maintenance and Repair
Environment
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
Highways
Independent Contractors
Mass Transit
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Sports and Recreation
State Employees
State Government - Procurement
Weeds
Environment
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
Highways
Independent Contractors
Mass Transit
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Sports and Recreation
State Employees
State Government - Procurement
Weeds
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |