MD HB371 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the threshold amount for certain indemnity mortgage transactions that are exempt from the recordation tax from less than $3,000,000 to less than $12,500,000; and applying the Act to instruments of writing recorded on or after July 1, 2024.
Title
Recordation Tax - Indemnity Mortgage Exemption - Threshold Amount
Sponsors
Del. Dalya Attar [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {333921/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613425/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Senate Requests House Recede
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Counties
Fees
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Recordation
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Clerks of Court
Counties
Fees
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Recordation
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 12 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 12 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |