MD HB44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before December 15, 2021; and extending the termination date for the Commission by 2 years to June 30, 2022.
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-08-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Fees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Fees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |