MD SB47 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before December 15, 2021; and extending the termination date for the Commission by 2 years to June 30, 2022.
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB44 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Fees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Cybersecurity
Emergency Services
Fees
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |