MD HB494 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a private-sector employer from requiring, as a condition of employment or continued employment, an employee or a prospective employee, under certain circumstances, to join or remain a member of a labor organization, pay charges to a labor organization, or pay a certain amount to a third party; establishing certain penalties for a violation of the Act; and requiring the Attorney General to take steps necessary to ensure effective enforcement of the Act.
Title
Labor and Employment - Private-Sector Employers - Right to Work
Sponsors
Del. Brian Chisholm [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Nino Mangione [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Stuart Schmidt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1203 (Carry Over) 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Court Costs
Damages
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
Leave
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Threats
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Court Costs
Damages
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
Leave
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Threats
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 4 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 4 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |