MD HB496 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amortization periods to be used for unfunded liabilities or surpluses of the State Retirement and Pension System; clarifying the application of a specified amortization period to specified changes; and phasing out a specified method for determining employer contribution rates for the employees' and teachers' retirement and pension systems.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Jones V) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Jones V) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476 |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
General Assembly
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
General Assembly
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement