MD HB51 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a correctional facility to provide an inmate who has completed a sentence of imprisonment for a felony conviction with a voter registration form before releasing the inmate; requiring a correctional facility to inform the inmate that the inmate will have the right to vote after the inmate's release from the correctional facility, and that the inmate must register to vote after the inmate's release in order to exercise the right to vote; etc.
Title
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-08-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 204.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0051?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0051f.pdf |