MD HB557 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB451
Note: Carry Over of previous HB749
Note: Carry Over of previous HB749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require certain persons who are convicted of, or granted probation before judgment for, certain criminal offenses related to driving while impaired by alcohol, a drug or drug combination or a combination of drugs and alcohol, to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for certain periods of time.
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB749 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
SB653 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
HB749 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
SB653 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0557?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0557f.pdf |