MD HB749 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB557
Note: Carry Over of previous HB952
Note: Carry Over of previous HB952
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require certain persons who are convicted of, or granted probation before judgment for, certain criminal offenses to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for certain periods of time.
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB749 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
HB952 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
SB672 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB952 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
SB672 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0749?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0749f.pdf |