MD HB580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-9)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-9)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of disaster service leave for employees in the Executive Branch of State government; and increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of paid leave the Secretary of Budget and Management may provide for uniformed services training or active uniformed services duty in a reserve unit of the armed forces or organized militia.
Title
Time to Serve Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7 |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB477 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Subjects
Armed Forces
Budget and Management, Department of
Emergencies
Leave
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Emergencies
Leave
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 9 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 9 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |