MD HB597 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1386
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the regulations adopted by the State Board of Education to govern the licensing and operation of child care centers to include provisions that establish certain qualifications for probationary employment for an individual applying for the first time to be a child care teacher in a certain child care center in the State; requiring a child care center at the end of a 6-month probationary period to terminate or reassign an individual who has not completed the required pre-service training; etc.
Title
Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB436 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
HB1386 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1386 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Age
Child Care
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Social Workers
Special Education
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Care
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Social Workers
Special Education
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment