MD HB630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement for certain transfers of service to be calculated under a certain formula; correcting a reference to a contribution rate for transfers of service into the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; and providing for eligibility and service credit in the Employees' Pension System for certain contractual employment by certain members.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {643622/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB491 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 37 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 37 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |