MD HB642 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Anne Arundel County; specifying the individuals who are qualified to hold the license include the holder of a barbershop permit or a beauty salon permit; authorizing the holder of a license to serve not more than 5 ounces of beer or wine to a customer for on-premises consumption; specifying the hours during which a license holder is authorized to serve beer and wine; stating that a license holder need not obtain a certain Sunday license; specifying a fee of $100; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-3) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433395/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB361 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Cosmetologists
Fees
Special Events
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Cosmetologists
Fees
Special Events
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |