MD SB361 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Anne Arundel County; specifying that the license may be issued to the holder of a certain barbershop permit or a certain beauty salon permit; authorizing the holder of a license to serve not more than 12 ounces of beer or 5 ounces of wine to a customer for on-premises consumption; specifying the hours during which a license holder is authorized to serve beer and wine; stating that a license holder need not obtain a certain Sunday license; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551 |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (130-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184836/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB642 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Cosmetologists
Fees
Special Events
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Cosmetologists
Fees
Special Events
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |