MD HB697 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act; and authorizing a specified agreement to exclude specified mediation communications from the application of the Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act.
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {662910/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |