MD HB850 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB155
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting county boards of education and certain schools and prekindergarten programs from taking certain discriminatory actions because of a person's race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; requiring each county board and certain schools and prekindergarten programs to print a certain statement in their student handbook; providing for the filing of a complaint under the Act with the State Superintendent of Schools; etc.
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsors
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] | Sen. Nick Charles [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] |
Del. Julian Ivey [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 553226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 553226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-36) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {713224/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-36) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (37-95) |
2022-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783226/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB666 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
HB155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age
Appeals
Claims
Comptroller
Counties
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Judges
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Residency
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Women
Appeals
Claims
Comptroller
Counties
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Judges
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Residency
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |