MD SB666 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB98
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting county boards of education and certain schools and prekindergarten programs from taking certain discriminatory actions because of a person's race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; requiring each county board and certain schools and prekindergarten programs to print a certain statement in their student handbook; authorizing a person alleging discrimination under the Act to file a complaint with the State Superintendent of Schools; etc.
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {643826/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB98 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB850 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
HB850 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Subjects
Age
Appeals
Claims
Comptroller
Counties
Curriculum
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Judges
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Residency
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Tuition
Women
Appeals
Claims
Comptroller
Counties
Curriculum
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Judges
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Residency
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Tuition
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |