MD HB867 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB505
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records relating to a probation before judgment for driving while impaired or driving while under the influence; and authorizing a certain person to petition the court to shield certain records relating to a probation before judgment for driving while impaired or driving while under the influence.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement and Shielding - Probation Before Judgment for Driving While Impaired or Under the Influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB118 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (113-24)
SB505 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (103-35)
SB505 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Expungement
Hearings
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Records
Repeat Offenders
State's Attorneys
Time
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Expungement
Hearings
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Records
Repeat Offenders
State's Attorneys
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |