MD SB118 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB660
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (113-24)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (113-24)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records relating to a probation before judgment for driving while impaired or driving while under the influence; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require certain persons who are convicted of, or granted certain probation for, certain drunk driving offenses to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for certain periods of time.
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Expungement and the Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-24) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {773221/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-15) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {193024/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB660 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB867 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
HB867 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Expungement
Hearings
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Records
Repeat Offenders
State's Attorneys
Time
Criminal Law - Procedures
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Expungement
Hearings
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Records
Repeat Offenders
State's Attorneys
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |