MD SB224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified definition of "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include a case in which a person received probation before judgment for assault in the second degree, if the crime was a specified domestically related crime.
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-34) (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19) (Y: 111 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-21) (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19) (Y: 111 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-21) (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (26-21) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |