MD SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB320
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1067
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1067
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2023, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; requiring the Department of the Environment to maintain a certain registry and to develop and make available on its website and in print certain resource materials; requiring a certain indoor air quality report; etc.
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB70 (Carry Over) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
HB129 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB1067 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB129 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB1067 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Disclosure
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Escrow Accounts
Eviction
Fees
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
internet
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Medical Conditions
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Escrow Accounts
Eviction
Fees
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
internet
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Medical Conditions
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0070?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0070f.pdf |