MD SB320 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2024, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; authorizing a tenant to deposit the tenant's rent in an escrow account under certain circumstances; authorizing a tax credit for taxpayers of certain residential properties who incur mold remediation costs; etc.
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB70 (Carry Over) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
HB361 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB361 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Attorneys
Comptroller
Disclosure
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Escrow Accounts
Eviction
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Medical Conditions
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Water
Comptroller
Disclosure
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Escrow Accounts
Eviction
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Medical Conditions
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 754 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0320?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0320f.pdf |