MD SB945 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the President of the Maryland Independent College and University Association, or the President's designee, to the Governing Board of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; requiring private nonprofit institutions of higher education that receive State funds to transfer specified student data to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System in accordance with a specified plan; establishing that a specified institution that transfers specified data to the system is not liable for a specified breach of confidentiality; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data Transfers
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Liability
Privacy
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Liability
Privacy
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology