ME HP0372 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Order, Directing the Joint Select Committee on Housing to Study the Foreclosure Process in the State
Title
Joint Order, Directing the Joint Select Committee on Housing to Study the Foreclosure Process in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-07-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-02-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-02-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUCHARME of Madison, TABLED pending PASSAGE. |
2023-02-14 | House | READ. |
2023-02-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=HP0372&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0372&item=1&snum=131 |