ME LD1305 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Discourage Tenants from Damaging Rental Property
Title
An Act To Discourage Tenants from Damaging Rental Property
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] |
Sen. Gary Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2013-05-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York for the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1305&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0448&item=1&snum=126 |