ME LD1464 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend Licensing, Certification and Registration Requirements for Health Care Providers and Other Facilities
Title
An Act To Amend Licensing, Certification and Registration Requirements for Health Care Providers and Other Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-02-09 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-593) in concurrence | |
2010-02-04 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Committee Amendment "B" (H-593) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-593) | |
2010-02-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-06-12 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-12 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Health and Human Services In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland taken from the Special Appropriations Table | |
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-364) in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-364) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-364) | |
2009-05-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-04-29 | (S) On motion by Senator Bartlett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |