ME LD1464 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Standards for Portable Electronic Device Insurance
Title
An Act To Establish Standards for Portable Electronic Device Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Sen. Joseph Brannigan [D] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Susan Morissette [R] |
Rep. Wesley Richardson [R] | Sen. Lois Snowe-mello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-212). | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-212) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Warren, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-02 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-212) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-212) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-212) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-04-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |
2011-04-12 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |