ME LD1524 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Eliminate the Excise Tax on Recreational Vehicles and Permit Municipal Adoption of Fees to Cover the Cost of Municipal Services to Campgrounds and Recreational Vehicle Parks
Title
An Act to Eliminate the Excise Tax on Recreational Vehicles and Permit Municipal Adoption of Fees to Cover the Cost of Municipal Services to Campgrounds and Recreational Vehicle Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |