ME LD1607 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Maine Affordable Housing Working Group
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Maine Affordable Housing Working Group
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-557), in concurrence. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) |
2016-03-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2016-02-25 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-25 | House | Representative HERBIG for the Joint Standing Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development pursuant to Public Law 2015, chapter 267, Part QQQQ, section 1 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |