ME LD1643 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Instructional Materials, Surveys, Analyses, Evaluations and Events at Public Schools
Title
An Act Regarding Instructional Materials, Surveys, Analyses, Evaluations and Events at Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #267 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #144 (Y: 75 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #144 (Y: 75 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 267 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 144 (Yeas 75 - Nays 66 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |