ME LD1668 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate Internal Hiring by Reforming the Use of Registers in the State Civil Service System
Title
An Act To Facilitate Internal Hiring by Reforming the Use of Registers in the State Civil Service System
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-449). |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-449) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-449) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report Accepted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Report READ |
2016-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-03-22 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |